THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 21:49:22 PM
Moore, Albert Rae
CPSO#:
85961
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
19 Feb 2007
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
19 Feb 2007
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: University of Manitoba, 1999
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Royal Victoria Hospital
Department of Anesthesia
1001 decarie
Montreal QC H4A 3J1
Phone: (514) 934-1934 Ext. 34880
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Quebec
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:30 Jun 2004 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ALBERT RAE MOORE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOORE is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
CF - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 19 Feb 2007 |