THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 8:32:07 AM
Dudebout, Jill Jacqueline
CPSO#:
85945
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
07 Feb 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
07 Feb 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: University of Saskatchewan College of Me, 2005
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Kingston General Hospital
Cancer Center of
Southeastern Ontario
25 King Street West
Kingston ON K7L 5P9
Phone: (613) 544-2631 Ext. 4501
Fax: (613) 546-8201
Electoral District: 06
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Kingston Health Sciences Centre |
Kingston |
Lennox and Addington County General Hospital |
Napanee |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2009 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Hematology |
Effective:06 Oct 2010 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JILL JACQUELINE DUDEBOUT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DUDEBOUT is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 19 Feb 2007 to 09 Mar 2007
EL - Hematology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Hematology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Hematology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 19 Feb 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 09 Mar 2007 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 07 Feb 2011 |