THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 2:59:45 AM
Al Otaibi, Faisal Aboud Jasser Al Ruwais
CPSO#:
85940
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of
30 Jun 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
10 Mar 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: King Saud University, Riyadh College of, 1997
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 07 Feb 2007 to 25 Apr 2007
PEAP - CF - Neurosurgery
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 26 Apr 2007 to 30 Jun 2007
CF - Neurosurgery
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
CF - Neurosurgery
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2008 to 03 Feb 2009
CF - Neurosurgery
University of Toronto, 04 Feb 2009 to 30 Jun 2009
CF - Neurosurgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Neurosurgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 07 Feb 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 25 Apr 2007 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 27 Apr 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 03 Feb 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 10 Mar 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2010 |