THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 21:53:01 PM
Chaklader, Mohsina
CPSO#:
85937
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
31 Aug 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
31 Aug 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
Bengali, English, Hindi, Urdu
Education: University of Ottawa, 2006
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 300
5734 Yonge Street
Toronto ON M2M 4E7
Phone: (416) 222-5501
Fax: (416) 222-1932
Electoral District: 10
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:09 May 2012 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Gastroenterology |
Effective:27 Oct 2016 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MOHSINA CHAKLADER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAKLADER is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 05 Feb 2007 to 04 Mar 2007
EL - Gastroenterology
University of Toronto, 19 Nov 2007 to 16 Dec 2007
EL - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 02 Jun 2008 to 29 Jun 2008
EL - Gastroenterology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 30 Jun 2008 to 25 Jul 2008
EL - Gastroenterology
University of Toronto, 26 Jul 2008 to 22 Aug 2008
EL - Gastroenterology
University of Toronto, 02 Mar 2009 to 30 Jun 2009
EL - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 21 Sep 2009 to 18 Oct 2009
EL - Gastroenterology
University of Toronto, 07 Jun 2010 to 30 Jun 2010
EL - Gastroenterology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 05 Feb 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 04 Mar 2007 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 19 Nov 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 16 Dec 2007 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 02 Jun 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 22 Aug 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 02 Mar 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 21 Sep 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 18 Oct 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 07 Jun 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 31 Aug 2012 |