THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 15:28:33 PM
Lee, Kar Cheong
CPSO#:
85930
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2008
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Cantonese, English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2005
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill ON L4C 4Z3
Phone: (905) 883-1212
Fax: (905) 883-2065
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Mackenzie Health |
Richmond Hill |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2009 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. KAR CHEONG LEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEE is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 11 Feb 2007 to 11 Mar 2007
EL - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 05 Jul 2007 to 29 Jul 2007
EL - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 19 Nov 2007 to 09 Dec 2007
EL - Infectious Diseases
University of Toronto, 10 Dec 2007 to 21 Dec 2007
EL - Endocrinology and Metabolism
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 11 Feb 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 11 Mar 2007 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 05 Jul 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 29 Jul 2007 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 19 Nov 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 21 Dec 2007 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2008 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2009 |