THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 0:00:38 AM
Ghaffari, Seyed Reza
CPSO#:
85913
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
04 Dec 2018
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
04 Dec 2018
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English, Farsi, German
Education: Islamic Azad University, 1998
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
90 Glenn Allan
Bridgewater NS B4V3S6
Phone: 9025275215
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Nova Scotia
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:06 Jun 2018 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SEYED REZA GHAFFARI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GHAFFARI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Feb 2007 to 25 Apr 2007
PEAP - CF - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 26 Apr 2007 to 31 Mar 2008
CF - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Apr 2008 to 30 Jun 2008
CF - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 15 Jun 2009
CF - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Feb 2007 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 26 Apr 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 15 Jun 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 04 Dec 2018 |