THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 12:07:55 PM
Amaladoss, Antony Sebastian Jesudoss
CPSO#:
85894
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
06 Aug 2021
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
29 Jan 2007
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Malayalam, Tamil
Education: University of Madras, 1977
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Amaladoss Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 2 2021
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 29 Jan 2007 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 29 Jan 2007 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 28 Jul 2008 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 07 May 2008 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 07 Aug 2009 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 07 Aug 2009 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 06 Aug 2021 |