skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 29/07/21 8:17:13 AM

Alberts, Hendrik Abraham

CPSO#: 85892

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 03 Jun 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Feb 2007

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Afrikaans, English, Zulu

Education:University of Pretoria, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Hendrik and Dr. Melissa Alberts Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 19 2019

Medical Records Location

Address: 7-20 Highway 20 Fonthill ON L0S 1E0
Date Received: 03 Jun 2019


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



South Africa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:16 Jun 2006 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Feb 2007
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 03 Jun 2019