THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 13:15:23 PM
Arora, Harpreet Singh
CPSO#:
85872
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
24 Dec 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
24 Dec 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Medical University of the Americas (Beli, 2002
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Grandview Medical Centre
Family Health Team
167 Hespeler Road
Cambridge ON N1R 3H7
Phone: (519) 623-4200
Fax: (519) 623-2546
Electoral District: 03
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 05 Jan 2007 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 05 Jan 2007 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 04 Jan 2010 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 04 Mar 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 24 Dec 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 24 Dec 2009 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 03 Feb 2011 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 03 Feb 2011 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 03 Feb 2011 |
|
Active |