THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
13/05/24 5:04:23 AM
Hogan, Angela Bridget
CPSO#:
85826
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jan 2007
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
22 Jun 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: University of Ottawa, 2005
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Hopital Montfort
Departement d' Anesthesiologie
713 chemin Montreal
Ottawa ON K1K 0T2
Phone: (613) 746-4621
Electoral District: 07
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Quebec
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hopital Montfort |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:08 Jun 2011 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ANGELA BRIDGET HOGAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HOGAN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jan 2007 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 31 Dec 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology
Queen's University, 01 Jan 2008 to 31 Dec 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology
Queen's University, 01 Jan 2009 to 31 Dec 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology
Queen's University, 01 Jan 2010 to 31 Dec 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology
Queen's University, 01 Jan 2011 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jan 2007 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 22 Jun 2011 |