THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 5:37:37 AM
Ghadai, Talha Ismaeel
CPSO#:
85821
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
07 Jan 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
07 Jan 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Spanish, Urdu
Education: Universidad Iberoamericana(UNIBE), 2003
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
1307 W League City Pkwy
League City TX 77573-6313
United States
Phone: 281-332-2626
Fax: 281-332-7272
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Texas
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Lakeridge Health,Clarington Site |
Bowmanville |
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site |
Oshawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:06 Jan 2009 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. TALHA ISMAEEL GHADAI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GHADAI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 2007 to 25 Mar 2007
AVP - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 26 Mar 2007 to 31 Dec 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 2008 to 31 Dec 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 09 Feb 2009 to 08 Feb 2010
CF - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jan 2007 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 26 Mar 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Dec 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 07 Jan 2009 |