THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/09/23 3:43:45 AM
Sivaharan, Ajantha
CPSO#:
85817
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
26 Jul 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
26 Jul 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Tamil
Education: Saba University School of Medicine, 2005
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Glazier Medical Centre
11 Gibb
Oshawa ON L1H 2J9
Phone: (905) 579-1212
Electoral District: 05
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:17 Jun 2013 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. AJANTHA SIVAHARAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SIVAHARAN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 2007 to 25 Mar 2007
AVP - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 26 Mar 2007 to 31 Dec 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 2008 to 31 Dec 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 2009 to 22 Feb 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jan 2007 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 26 Mar 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 22 Feb 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 25 Feb 2009 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 25 Jan 2012 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 13 Sep 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 26 Jul 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 26 Jul 2013 |