THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
18/04/24 7:56:49 AM
Maraj, Vikesh
CPSO#:
85807
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
03 Mar 2008
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
03 Mar 2008
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Afrikaans, English
Education: Medical University of South Africa(Medun, 2000
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
5565 Wyandotte Street East
Windsor ON N8S 4T9
Phone: (519) 974-2924
Fax: (519) 948-9033
Electoral District: 01
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:06 Dec 2007 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. VIKESH MARAJ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARAJ is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 02 Jan 2007 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 02 Jan 2007 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 07 Nov 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 03 Mar 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 03 Mar 2008 |
Concerns
Source:
Other
Active Date: June 20, 2023
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Finding of Guilt
Vikesh Maraj was found guilty of the following offence:
1. Having over 80 mg blood alcohol concentration within two hours after ceasing to operate a conveyance, contrary to s.320.14(1)(b) of the Criminal Code of Canada.
Date: June 20, 2023
SENTENCE: Fine of $5,000; 12 month driving prohibition; Victim fine surcharge of $1,500, Restitution payment of $14,000 for damage to property of victims.