skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 18/10/21 0:36:16 AM

Yu-Siao, Barbara Ann

CPSO#: 85801

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 19 Jun 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 19 Jun 2009

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Urdu

Education:University of Karachi, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
69 Facer Street
St Catharines ON  L2M 5J3
Phone: (905) 935-2828
Fax: (905) 935-5478 Electoral District: 04

Additional Practice Location(s)

1200 Fourth Ave.
St Catharines ON  L2S 0A9
Canada
Phone: 905-3784647 Ext. 46573
Fax: 9057044406
County: Regional Municipality of Niagara
Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: B. Yu-Siao Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 17 2021

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site St Catharines

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective:14 Apr 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. BARBARA ANN YU-SIAO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YU-SIAO is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 06 Dec 2006
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 06 Dec 2006
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 05 Dec 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 19 Jun 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 2009