THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/04/24 8:41:45 AM
Rajji, Tarek K
CPSO#:
85792
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Dec 2006
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
05 Nov 2008
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: American University of Beirut, 1999
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
C A M H
Room 6312
80 Workman Way
Toronto ON M6J 1H4
Phone: (416) 535-8501
Fax: (416) 583-1307
Electoral District: 10
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Lebanon
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health - College Street Site |
Toronto |
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health |
Toronto |
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health,- Russell Street Site |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:16 Apr 2008 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. TAREK K RAJJI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAJJI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Dec 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
CF - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
CF - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
CF - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Nov 2009
CF - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Dec 2006 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 05 Nov 2008 |