THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/04/24 21:11:02 PM
Halankar, Jaydeep Arun
CPSO#:
85791
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
18 Nov 2019
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
18 Nov 2019
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Mumbai, 2000
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
UHN Toronto General Hospital
Joint Department of Medical Imaging
1 - P M B 286
585 University Ave
Toronto ON M5G 2N2
Phone: (416) 566-1358
Electoral District: 10
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
India
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario,Cancer Institu |
Toronto |
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site |
Toronto |
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site |
Toronto |
Women's College Hospital |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Diagnostic Radiology |
Effective:18 Nov 2019 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Nov 2006 to 22 Jan 2007
PEAP - CF - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Toronto, 23 Jan 2007 to 31 Oct 2007
CF - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Toronto, 01 Nov 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
CF - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
CF - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 28 Feb 2011
CF - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - Diagnostic Radiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 27 Nov 2006 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Jan 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 19 Nov 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 19 Nov 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 28 Feb 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2014 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2016 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 18 Nov 2019 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 17 Nov 2026 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Feb 2022 |
|
Active |