THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 3:00:34 AM
Ambreen, Shazia
CPSO#:
85788
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
12 Feb 2007
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
12 Feb 2007
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Karachi, 1998
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Stevenson Memorial Hospital
PO Box 4000
200 Fletcher Crescent
Alliston ON L9R 1W7
Phone: (705) 435-6281
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Southlake Regional Health Centre |
Newmarket |
Stevenson Memorial Hospital |
Alliston |
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital |
Brampton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:15 Jan 2007 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SHAZIA AMBREEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AMBREEN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 02 Oct 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Anaesthesia)
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 04 Oct 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Anaesthesia)
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2024 to 30 Jun 2024
CF - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 27 Nov 2006 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 27 Nov 2006 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 26 Nov 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 12 Feb 2007 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 12 Feb 2007 |