skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 16/10/21 8:10:44 AM

Acharya, Chhaya Vipul

CPSO#: 85766

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 26 Jan 2007
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 26 Jan 2007

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Gujarati, Hindi

Education:Baroda University, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Bluewater Health
Department of Laboratory Services
89 Norman street
Sarnia ON  N7T 6S3
Phone: (519) 464-4500 Ext. 5486
Fax: (519) 383-7274 Electoral District: 01

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Acharya C. Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 11 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Acharya ( CPSO# 85766 )

Business Address:
Bluewater Health
Department of Laboratory Services
89 Norman Street
Sarnia ON  N7T 6S3
Phone Number: (519) 454-4500

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Bluewater Health Sarnia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective:31 Jul 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. CHHAYA VIPUL ACHARYA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ACHARYA is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 04 Dec 2006
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 04 Dec 2006
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 03 Dec 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 26 Jan 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jan 2007