THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 1:33:45 AM
Patel, Serina Vinod
CPSO#:
85756
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
14 Feb 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
14 Feb 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: Memorial University of Newfoundland Facu, 2005
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
800 Commissioners Road East
P.O. Box 5010
London ON N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 685-8494
Electoral District: 02
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
London Health Sciences Centre,Children's Hospital of Western Ontario |
London |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:30 Dec 2009 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Pediatric Hematology/Oncology |
Effective:23 Sep 2014 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SERINA VINOD PATEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PATEL is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 20 Nov 2006 to 15 Dec 2006
EL - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology
University of Toronto, 28 May 2007 to 22 Jun 2007
EL - Paediatric Haematology
University of Ottawa, 25 Aug 2008 to 19 Sep 2008
EL - Paediatric Nephrology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 6 - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 08 Feb 2013
PostGrad Yr 6 - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology
University of Ottawa, 09 Feb 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 7 - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 10 Feb 2014
PostGrad Yr 7 - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 20 Nov 2006 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 15 Dec 2006 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 28 May 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 22 Jun 2007 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 25 Aug 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 19 Sep 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 10 Feb 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 14 Feb 2014 |