THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 13:31:50 PM
Louzada, Martha de Lacerda
CPSO#:
85743
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
11 May 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
11 May 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French, Portuguese
Education: Souza Marques Technical Educational Foun, 1999
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
London Health Sciences Centre
Victoria Campus Site
Dept of Haematology Room E6-213
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 685-8500 Ext. 52391
Fax: (519) 685-8294
Electoral District: 02
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
London Health Sciences Centre |
London |
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital |
London |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Hematology |
Effective:11 May 2010 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:11 May 2010 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Nov 2006 to 30 Nov 2006
PEAP - CF - Hematology
University of Ottawa, 01 Dec 2006 to 31 Oct 2007
CF - Hematology
University of Ottawa, 01 Nov 2007 to 30 Oct 2008
CF - Hematology
University of Ottawa, 31 Oct 2008 to 30 Oct 2009
CF - Hematology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Nov 2006 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Dec 2006 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Oct 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 11 May 2010 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 24 May 2017 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Jul 2017 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 06 Dec 2023 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 06 Dec 2023 |
|
Active |