skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 21/10/21 5:06:22 AM

Ali, Maqsood

CPSO#: 85735

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 09 Jun 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 09 Jun 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Pashto, Urdu

Education:University of Peshawar, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Milton Kids Clinic
Bldg C
1 - 604 Santa Maria Blvd
Milton ON  L9T 6J5
Phone: 905-878-0055 Electoral District: 04

Additional Practice Location(s)

10 Bronte St S
Treehouse Pediatrics
Milton ON  L9T 9M2
Canada
Phone: (905) 876-5056
Fax: ()289) 6702176
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Maqsood Ali Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 30 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Ali ( CPSO# 85735 )

Business Address:
Milton Kids Clinic
Building C
Unit 1
604 Santa Maria Boulevard
Milton ON  L9T 6J5

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Milton District Hos,pital Milton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 27 Oct 2006
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 27 Oct 2006
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 26 Oct 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 06 May 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 09 Jun 2014

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 09 Jun 2014 Active
             Dr. Maqsood Ali may practise medicine independently in paediatrics, only.