THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/04/24 19:56:27 PM
Staroselsky, Arthur
CPSO#:
85730
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
30 Oct 2006
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
03 Sep 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Hebrew, Russian, Ukrainian
Education: Doneck Medical University, 1989
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
30 Disera Drive U100
Thornhill ON L4J 0A7
Phone: 9057717755
Fax: 9057717752
Electoral District: 05
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Staroselsky Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 20 2021
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Israel
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:31 Aug 2009 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ARTHUR STAROSELSKY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STAROSELSKY is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 04 Sep 2007 to 23 Dec 2007
AVP - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 24 Dec 2007 to 03 Sep 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 04 Sep 2008 to 03 Sep 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Apr 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Clinical Pharmacology and Toxicology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Clinical Pharmacology and Toxicology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 30 Oct 2006 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 22 Jan 2007 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 04 Sep 2007 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 24 Dec 2007 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 03 Sep 2009 |