THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 11:25:34 AM
Ryglewicz, Kamila Joanna
CPSO#:
85718
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
25 Aug 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
25 Aug 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Bekasiak, Kamila Joanna (used until: 31 May 2012 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Polish
Education: Poznan University of Medical Sciences, 2006
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 201
13278 Tecumseh Road East
Tecumseh ON N8N 3T6
Phone: (519) 979-7878
Fax: (519) 979-7872
Electoral District: 01
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:10 Dec 2008 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. KAMILA JOANNA RYGLEWICZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RYGLEWICZ is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Nov 2006 to 20 Jan 2007
AVP - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 21 Jan 2007 to 31 Oct 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Nov 2007 to 31 Oct 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Nov 2006 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 21 Jan 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Oct 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 13 Mar 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 25 Aug 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 25 Aug 2009 |