skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 27/10/21 19:19:29 PM

Al-Houssan, Walid

CPSO#: 85716

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 19 Oct 2006
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 15 Dec 2017

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English, French

Education:University of Damascus Faculty of Medici, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunrise Medical Centre
1460 Merivale Road
Nepean ON  K2E 5P2
Phone: (613) 727-7473
Fax: (613) 727-2754 Electoral District: 07

Additional Practice Location(s)

309 desjardins boul
maniwaki QC  J9E 2E7
Canada
Phone: (819) 449-4690
Fax: (819) 441-3368
County: 
Electoral District: 

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Al Houssan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jun 21 2018

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Quebec

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Oct 2006
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 15 Dec 2017
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 15 Dec 2017

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
member Effective: 15 Dec 2017 Active
             As from December 15, 2017, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Walid Al-Houssan, in
            accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Al-Houssan to the
            College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                        UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT 
                                          ("Undertaking")
                  
                                                of
                  
                                    DR. WALID AL-HOUSSAN
                                          ("Dr. Al-Houssan")
                  
                                                to 
                  
                        COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                          (the "College")
                  
                  
                  
            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

                  "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
                  to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
                  amended; 
                  
                  "Discipline Committee" means the Discipline Committee of the College;
                  
                  "ICRC" means the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee of the
                  College;
                  
                  "OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;
                  
                  "Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the
                  public. 
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. Al-Houssan, certificate of registration number 85716, am a member
                  of the College.  
            (3)   I, Dr. Al-Houssan, am aware of the College's concern about protecting the
                  public and acknowledge that the College has received information
                  regarding my conduct and that the College is conducting an investigation
                  into the information

            (4)   I, Dr. Al-Houssan, acknowledge that the College has accepted this
                  Undertaking in lieu of making an Order under section 25.4 of the Code at
                  this time.

            (5)   I, Dr. Al-Houssan, acknowledge that this Undertaking does not preclude
                  the ICR Committee from making an order at a later date in accordance with
                  the Code.

            (6)   I, Dr. Al-Houssan, acknowledge that this Undertaking continues in force
                  until the matters currently under investigation are disposed of by the
                  ICRC or, in the event of a referral to discipline, by a panel of the
                  Discipline Committee.

            B.    UNDERTAKING AND ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (7)   I, Dr. Al-Houssan, undertake to abide by the provisions of this
                  Undertaking, effective immediately ("Effective Date").

            (8)   Practice Restrictions

                  (a)   I, Dr. Al-Houssan, undertake that I shall not engage in any
                        professional encounters, in person or otherwise ("Professional
                        Encounter(s)"), with patients of any age, in any jurisdiction,
                        unless the Professional Encounter takes place in the continuous
                        presence and under the continuous observation of a monitor who is a
                        regulated health professional acceptable to the College (the
                        "Practice Monitor"), and unless the other requirements provided in
                        this Undertaking are fulfilled. For further clarity, I understand
                        that I must not be alone with any patient, for any length of time,
                        during any Professional Encounter, whether or not the parent or
                        guardian of the patient is also present.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Al-Houssan, acknowledge that I have reviewed the Practice
                        Monitor's undertaking, attached hereto as Appendix "A" and
                        understand what is required of the Practice Monitor including, but
                        not limited to:
                  
                              1.    providing reports (as described in the Practice
                                    Monitor's undertaking) to the College on at least a
                                    monthly basis; 
                  
                              2.    remaining present at all times during all Professional
                                    Encounters with all patients; 
                  
                              3.    carefully observing all of my Professional Encounters
                                    with patients, including but not limited to physical
                                    and internal examinations. I further acknowledge my
                                    obligation to ensure the Practice Monitor's view of all
                                    of my Professional Encounters with patients, including
                                    physical and internal examinations, is unobstructed at
                                    all times; 
                  
                              4.    refraining from performing any other functions, except
                                    those required in the Practice Monitor's undertaking
                                    attached as Appendix "A",  while observing me in all my
                                    Professional Encounters with patients; 
                  
                              5.    maintaining a log of all Professional Encounters with
                                    patients in the form attached to this Undertaking as
                                    Appendix "B" (the "Log");
                  
                              6.    initialing all corresponding entries in the records of
                                    patients noted in the Log; and
                  
                              7.    submitting the original Log to the College on a monthly
                                    basis.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Al-Houssan, undertake to maintain my own copy of the Log at
                        all times, and to make it available to the College upon request. 
                  
            (9)   I, Dr. Al-Houssan, undertake to inform the College of each and every
                  location that I practise or have privileges including, but not limited
                  to, hospital(s), clinic(s) and office(s), in any jurisdiction
                  (collectively my "Practice Location(s)"), within five (5) days of
                  executing this Undertaking.  Going forward, I further undertake to inform
                  the College of any and all new Practice Locations within five (5) days of
                  commencing practice at that location.

            (10)  Posting a Sign

                  (a)   I, Dr. Al-Houssan, undertake that, effective immediately, I shall
                        post a sign in all waiting rooms, examination rooms and consulting
                        rooms, in all of my Practice Locations, in a clearly visible and
                        secure location, in the form set out in Appendix "C" that states:
                        "Dr. Al-Houssan must not  have professional encounters, in person
                        or otherwise, with patients, of any age, unless in the continuous
                        presence and under the continuous observation of a practice monitor
                        acceptable to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario.
                        Dr. Al-Houssan must not be alone during any professional encounter
                        with any patient. Further information may be found on the College
                        website at www.cpso.on.ca".
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Al-Houssan, undertake to post a certified translation(s) in
                        any language(s) in which I provide services, of the sign described
                        in section (10)(a), in all waiting rooms, examination rooms and
                        consulting rooms, in all of my Practice Locations, in a clearly
                        visible and secure location, in the form set out at Appendix "C."
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Al-Houssan, undertake to provide the certified
                        translation(s) described in section (10)(b), to the College within
                        thirty (30) days of executing this Undertaking.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Al-Houssan, undertake that if I elect, after the execution
                        of this Undertaking, to provide services in any other language(s),
                        I will notify the College prior to providing any such services.
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. Al-Houssan, undertake to provide to the College the
                        certified translation(s) described in section (10)(b) prior to
                        providing services in the language(s) described in section (10)(d).
                  
            (11)  Notifying Patients 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Al-Houssan, undertake to ensure that each patient with whom
                        I have a Professional Encounter is directly notified, prior to the
                        Professional Encounter, of the details of the restriction described
                        in section (8)(a), above. 
                  
            (12)  I, Dr. Al-Houssan, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely
                  responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc.
                  arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this
                  Undertaking. 

            (13)  I, Dr. Al-Houssan, acknowledge that the College will provide this
                  Undertaking to any chief(s) of staff, or a colleague with similar
                  responsibilities, at any Practice Location ("Chief(s) of Staff").

            (14)  I, Dr. Al-Houssan, acknowledge that a breach of any provision of this
                  Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and may
                  result in a referral of specified allegations to the Discipline
                  Committee.

            (15)  I, Dr. Al-Houssan, acknowledge that I have read and understand the
                  provisions of this Undertaking, and that I have obtained independent
                  legal counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived
                  my right to do so.

            (16)  I, Dr. Al-Houssan, acknowledge that, in the event of a referral to the
                  Discipline Committee and of an appeal of any Order of the Discipline
                  Committee, if the Discipline Committee has directed the Registrar to
                  revoke, suspend, or impose terms and conditions on my certificate of
                  registration, that Order will take effect immediately despite any appeal.

            (17)  I, Dr. Al-Houssan, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or
                  referred to in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

            (18)  I, Dr. Al-Houssan, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms,
                  conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the
                  purposes of section 23 of the Code. 

            (19)  Public Register

                  (a)   I, Dr. Al-Houssan, acknowledge that, during the time period that
                        this Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be
                        posted on the Public Register.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Al-Houssan, acknowledge that, in addition to this
                        Undertaking being posted in accordance with section (19)(a) above,
                        the following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during
                        the time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:
                  
                              Dr. Al-Houssan is the subject of an investigation into
                              allegations of professional misconduct. As a result:
                  
                              Dr. Al-Houssan must not engage in any professional
                              encounters, in person or otherwise, with patients of any age,
                              in any jurisdiction, unless the patient encounter takes place
                              in the continuous presence of a monitor who is a regulated
                              health professional acceptable to the College, and unless the
                              other requirements provided in Dr. Al-Houssan's Undertaking
                              with the College are fulfilled.  For further clarity, Dr.
                              Al-Houssan must not be alone with any patient during any
                              professional encounter.
                  
                              Dr. Al-Houssan shall post a sign in all waiting rooms,
                              examination rooms and consulting rooms, in all Practice
                              Locations, in a clearly visible and secure location, that
                              states: "Dr. Al-Houssan  must not have professional
                              encounters, in person or otherwise, with patients of any age,
                              unless in the continuous presence of a practice monitor
                              acceptable to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of
                              Ontario.  Dr. Al-Houssan must not be alone with any patient
                              during any professional encounter. Further information may be
                              found on the College website at www.cpso.on.ca".
                  
            C.    CONSENT

            (20)  I, Dr. Al-Houssan, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make
                  appropriate enquiries of OHIP and/or any person who or institution that
                  may have relevant information, in order for the College to monitor my
                  compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.

            (21)  I, Dr. Al-Houssan, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP consent
                  form, attached hereto as Appendix "D".

            (22)  I, Dr. Al-Houssan, consent to submit and not interfere with, unannounced
                  inspections of my Practice Location(s) and patient records by the College
                  and to any other activity the College deems necessary in order to monitor
                  my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.

            (23)  I, Dr. Al-Houssan, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide
                  the following information to all Practice Monitors:

                  (a)   any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my
                        entering into this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   any information arising from any investigation into, or assessment
                        of, my practice; and 
                  
                  (c)   any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with
                        this Undertaking.
                  
            (24)  I, Dr. Al-Houssan, give my irrevocable consent to all Practice Monitors
                  to disclose to the College, and to one another, any information:

                  (a)   relevant to this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   relevant to the provisions of the Practice Monitor's undertaking
                        set out at Appendix "A"; and/or
                  
                  (c)   relevant for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with this
                        Undertaking.
                  
            (25)  I, Dr. Al-Houssan, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide
                  all Chief(s) of Staff with any information the College has that led to
                  the circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any
                  information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this
                  Undertaking.

            (26)  I, Dr. Al-Houssan, give my irrevocable consent to all Chief(s) of Staff
                  to disclose to the College, and to one another, any information relevant
                  to this Undertaking and/or relevant for the purposes of monitoring my
                  compliance with this Undertaking.

Concerns

Source: Other
Active Date: August 27, 2019
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Bail Conditions:

On May 31, 2019, the following conditions of release (i.e., bail conditions) were imposed on Walid Al-Houssan:

1. Do not contact or communicate in any way either directly or indirectly, by any physical, electronic or other means, with individuals specified in the Recognizance of Bail.

2. You are not to have any professional interaction with female patients, except or unless in the presence of either one of the chaperones specified in the Recognizance of Bail or anyone who is a regulated health professional who is approved by the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario.

3. You are to post a sign in a visible area of the waiting room and in each examination room stating his name and notification that he is not to have any professional interaction with female patients, except or unless in the present of a chaperone.

 

Source: Compliance and Monitoring Department
Active Date: July 25, 2019
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College By-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a SCERP:
Download Full Document (PDF)

 

Source: Compliance and Monitoring Department
Active Date: July 25, 2019
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person and Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee (“ICRC”) in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" or a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of ICRC. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s ICRC may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed.

Summaries will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. This posting requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person and a SCERP:
Download Full Document (PDF)

 

Source: Compliance and Monitoring Department
Active Date: February 15, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College By-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the
disposition includes a SCERP:
Download Full Document (PDF)

 

Source: Member
Active Date: December 15, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Walid Al-Houssan to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective December 15, 2017:

Dr. Al-Houssan is the subject of an investigation into allegations of professional misconduct. As a result:

Dr. Al-Houssan must not engage in any professional encounters, in person or otherwise, with patients of any age, in any jurisdiction, unless the patient encounter takes place in the continuous presence of a monitor who is a regulated health professional acceptable to the College, and unless the other requirements provided in Dr. Al-Houssan’s Undertaking with the College are fulfilled. For further clarity, Dr. Al-Houssan must not be alone with any patient during any professional encounter.

Dr. Al-Houssan shall post a sign in all waiting rooms, examination rooms and consulting rooms, in all Practice Locations, in a clearly visible and secure location, that states: “Dr. Al-Houssan must not have professional encounters, in person or otherwise, with patients of any age, unless in the continuous presence of a practice monitor acceptable to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario. Dr. Al-Houssan must not be alone with any patient during any professional encounter. Further information may be found on the College website at www.cpso.on.ca”.

 

Source: Other
Active Date: May 18, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
CRIMINAL CHARGES

Dr. Walid Al-Houssan was charged with the following offences:

(1) 2 counts of sexual assault, on or about March 28, 2012 and May 21, 2016, contrary to Section 271 of the Criminal Code of Canada.

Date of charges: May 18, 2017
Place of charges: Ottawa, Ontario
Ottawa Police Service