THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
13/05/24 2:47:23 AM
Clark, Daniel Ryan
CPSO#:
85703
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
09 Jan 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
09 Jan 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Sydney, Sydney Medical Sch, 2004
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
2200 Eglinton Ave W
Credit Valley Hospital
Emergency Department
Mississauga ON L5M 2N1
Phone: 9058132200
Electoral District: 05
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Australia
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Emergency Medicine |
Effective:07 May 2014 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. DANIEL RYAN CLARK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CLARK is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 13 Sep 2013
PEAP - CF - Emergency Medicine
University of Toronto, 14 Sep 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Emergency Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2013 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 14 Sep 2013 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 09 Jan 2015 |