THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 18:23:41 PM
Furlan, Andrea Dompieri
CPSO#:
85696
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Oct 2008
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
01 Oct 2008
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Portuguese
Education: University of Sao Paulo, 1992
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Toronto Rehabilitation Institute
University Centre
550 University Avenue
Toronto ON M5G 2A2
Phone: (416) 597-3422 Ext. 4607
Fax: (416) 597-7074
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
University Health Network,Toronto Rehabilitation Institute |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation |
Effective:01 Oct 2008 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 16 Oct 2006 to 07 Jan 2007
PEAP - CF - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
University of Toronto, 08 Jan 2007 to 30 Jun 2007
CF - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
CF - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Sep 2008
CF - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 16 Oct 2006 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 07 Jan 2007 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 08 Jan 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Sep 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Oct 2008 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Jul 2014 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 01 Jul 2014 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 15 Feb 2024 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 15 Feb 2024 |
|
Active |