THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
18/04/24 22:28:44 PM
Bathina, Sudheer Reddy
CPSO#:
85689
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
10 Mar 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
10 Apr 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Andhra Medical College, 1997
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Diagnostic Radiology |
Effective:03 Jun 2013 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 12 Oct 2006 to 08 Nov 2006
PEAP - CF - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Ottawa, 09 Nov 2006 to 31 Aug 2007
CF - Diagnostic Radiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 12 Oct 2006 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 09 Nov 2006 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Aug 2007 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 10 Apr 2015 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 10 Mar 2016 |