THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
21/09/23 5:10:13 AM
Rowan-Legg, Anne Kingsley
CPSO#:
85681
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
15 Nov 2007
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
15 Nov 2007
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: McMaster University, 2003
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
CHEO
Division of Pediatric Medicine
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON K1H 8L1
Phone: (613) 737-7600 Ext. 2571
Fax: (613) 738-4878
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:30 Jun 2007 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ANNE KINGSLEY ROWAN-LEGG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROWAN-LEGG is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 23 Oct 2006 to 19 Nov 2006
EL - Community Medicine
University of Ottawa, 02 Jan 2007 to 26 Jan 2007
EL - Paediatric Radiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Oct 2006 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 19 Nov 2006 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 02 Jan 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 26 Jan 2007 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 15 Nov 2007 |