THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 13:19:11 PM
Sivalingam, Sriharan
CPSO#:
85671
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of
15 Jun 2007
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
21 May 2007
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
ENGLISH
Education: University of Toronto, 2006
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Urology |
Effective:30 Jun 2011 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 19 Oct 2006 to 15 Nov 2006
EL - Emergency Medicine
University of Toronto, 21 May 2007 to 15 Jun 2007
EL - Diagnostic Radiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 19 Oct 2006 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 15 Nov 2006 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 21 May 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 15 Jun 2007 |