THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/09/23 6:57:17 AM
Aulakh, Lakyntiew Patsha Syiemlieh
CPSO#:
85662
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
06 Aug 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
06 Aug 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi
Education: Dibrugarh University, 1991
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Health Sciences North
680 Kirkwood Drive
Sudbury ON P3E 1X3
Phone: (705) 675-5900
Fax: (705) 671-3031
Electoral District: 08
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Health Sciences North |
Sudbury |
Manitoulin Health Centre |
Little Current |
St Joseph's Continuing Care Centre,Sudbury |
Sudbury |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:14 May 2014 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 02 Oct 2006 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 02 Oct 2006 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 01 Oct 2009 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 15 Aug 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 06 Aug 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 06 Aug 2009 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 17 Feb 2010 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 17 Feb 2010 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 17 Feb 2010 |
|
Active |