THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 10:53:29 AM
Kupeyan, Kristen Ann
CPSO#:
85660
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
31 Jul 2008
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
31 Jul 2008
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: St. Matthew's University, 2004
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
620 Kenwood Blvd
Lasalle ON N9J 0C9
Phone: 519-915-4514
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Florida
USA - Michigan
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus |
Windsor |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:10 Jul 2008 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. KRISTEN ANN KUPEYAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KUPEYAN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 02 Oct 2006 to 27 Oct 2006
EL - Emergency Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 02 Oct 2006 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 27 Oct 2006 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 23 Jul 2007 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 19 Sep 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 31 Jul 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 31 Jul 2008 |