THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 16:39:07 PM
Girgis, Ireen Makram Aziz
CPSO#:
85653
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
14 Feb 2008
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
20 Jul 2021
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Cairo University Faculty of Medicine, 1995
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Unit 6
10671 Chinguacousy Road
Brampton ON L7A 0N5
Phone: (905) 840-4343
Fax: (905) 840-4303
Electoral District: 05
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:06 Dec 2007 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. IREEN MAKRAM AZIZ GIRGIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GIRGIS is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 29 Sep 2006 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 29 Sep 2006 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 28 Sep 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 14 Feb 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 14 Feb 2008 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 08 Dec 2019 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 08 Dec 2019 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 20 Jul 2021 |
Concerns
Source:
Compliance and Monitoring Department
Active Date: January 16, 2019
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:
A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person.
Download Full Document (PDF)