THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 9:13:13 AM
Samani, Amir Abbas
CPSO#:
85633
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Nov 2006
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Farsi
Education: Tehran University of Medical Sciences Sc, 1992
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
1235 Wilson Av,
Laboratory Medicine (2e2032)
Toronto ON M3M 0B2
Phone: (416) 242-1000 Ext. 62013
Fax: (416) 242 1128
Electoral District: 10
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Iran
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Southlake Regional Health Centre |
Newmarket |
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital |
Brampton |
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Pathology |
Effective:30 Jun 2011 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. AMIR ABBAS SAMANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAMANI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Nov 2006 to 24 Jan 2007
AVP - General Pathology
McMaster University, 25 Jan 2007 to 31 Mar 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Pathology
McMaster University, 01 Apr 2007 to 31 Mar 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Pathology
McMaster University, 01 Apr 2008 to 31 Mar 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Pathology
McMaster University, 01 Apr 2009 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Pathology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 31 Mar 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Pathology
University of Toronto, 01 Apr 2010 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Pathology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Pathology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Nov 2006 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 25 Jan 2007 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2011 |