THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 5:00:21 AM
Kim, Alexandra Victorovna
CPSO#:
85619
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of
30 Jun 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
01 Jul 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: MOSCOW MEDICAL STOMATOLOGY INSTITUTE, 1999
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Sep 2006 to 12 Nov 2006
PEAP - CF - Neurology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 13 Nov 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
CF - Neurology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
CF - Neurology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2008 to 01 Dec 2008
CF - Neurology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Neurology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Neurology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 20 Sep 2006 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 12 Nov 2006 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 21 Nov 2006 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 01 Dec 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Jun 2012 |