THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 7:56:08 AM
Gandhi, Harjeet Singh
CPSO#:
85616
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
25 May 2023
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
25 May 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu
Education: Guru Nanak Dev University, 1979
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Orthopedic Surgery |
Effective:01 Jun 2009 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 20 Sep 2006 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 20 Sep 2006 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 01 Jul 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Jul 2007 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 23 Aug 2007 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 12 Aug 2008 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 29 Jun 2009 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 06 Oct 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 25 May 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 25 May 2010 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 25 May 2023 |