skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 22/05/22 7:45:53 AM

Almgrahi, Abdulaziz A A

CPSO#: 85600

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 13 Sep 2006
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 20 Jun 2008

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education: Al-Arab Medical University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
103 Hospital Drive
Saskatoon SK  S7N 0W8
Phone: (306) 655-1808
Fax: (306) 655-1806

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



British Columbia
Manitoba
Saskatchewan

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Nuclear Medicine Effective:27 May 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ABDULAZIZ A A ALMGRAHI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALMGRAHI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
CF - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
CF - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Sep 2008
CF - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Sep 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 2008