THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 2:32:25 AM
Popuri, Ramu
CPSO#:
85598
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
23 Jul 2008
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
23 Jul 2008
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Telugu
Education: University of Liverpool School of Medici, 1995
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Cambridge Memorial Hospital
Department of Diagnostic Imaging
700 Coronation Boulevard
Cambridge ON N1R 3G2
Phone: (519) 621-2330
Electoral District: 03
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Australia
United Kingdom
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Cambridge Memorial Hospital |
Cambridge |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Diagnostic Radiology |
Effective:27 May 2008 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. RAMU POPURI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. POPURI is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 13 Sep 2006 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 13 Sep 2006 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 23 Jul 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 23 Jul 2008 |