THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 1:36:36 AM
Albar, Nezar Yassin Ali
CPSO#:
85586
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of
07 Nov 2008
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
11 Sep 2006
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
ENGLISH
Education: King Faisal University, 1998
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2005 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Oct 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Endocrinology and Metabolism
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Sep 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Endocrinology and Metabolism
University of Ottawa, 01 Oct 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Endocrinology and Metabolism
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Sep 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Endocrinology and Metabolism
University of Ottawa, 01 Oct 2008 to 07 Nov 2008
CF - Endocrinology and Metabolism
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 11 Sep 2006 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 07 Nov 2008 |