THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 19:27:26 PM
Power, Daniel Jonathan
CPSO#:
85560
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
30 Aug 2006
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Aug 2006
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: Memorial University of Newfoundland Facu, 1995
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Montfort Hospital
Department of Anesthesia
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON K1K 0T2
Phone: (613) 746-4621
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hopital Montfort |
Ottawa |
Ottawa Hospital |
Ottawa |
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:11 Jun 1997 |
CFPC Specialist |
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) |
Effective:17 Dec 2004 |
CFPC Specialist |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:04 Sep 2010 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. DANIEL JONATHAN POWER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. POWER is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 05 Sep 2007 to 04 Sep 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology
University of Ottawa, 05 Sep 2008 to 04 Sep 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology
University of Ottawa, 05 Sep 2009 to 04 Sep 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Anesthesiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 31 Aug 2012
CF - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Aug 2006 |