skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 03/08/21 8:00:17 AM

Cheng, Julianna Veronica Marie

CPSO#: 85548

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 30 Jan 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jan 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: Borbely, Julianna Veronica Marie (used until: 28 Jan 2015 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University Of Toronto, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
486 Advance Blvd
Tecumseh ON  N8N 0B8
Phone: 5197358100
Fax: 5197358101 Electoral District: 01

Additional Practice Location(s)

Windsor Regional Hospital
MET Campus
1995 Lens Avenue
Windsor ON  N8W 1L9
Canada
Phone: 519-254-5577
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Julianna Cheng Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 05 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Cheng ( CPSO# 85548 )

Business Address:
13390 Lanoue Street
Tecumseh ON  N8N 5E1
Phone Number: (519) 735-8100

Business Address:
Windsor Regional Hospital
1995 Lens Avenue
Windsor ON  N8W 1L9
Phone Number: (519) 254-5577

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Windsor Regional Hospital,Metropolitan Site Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective:04 Oct 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JULIANNA VERONICA MARIE CHENG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHENG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Western University, 01 Sep 2006 to 06 Sep 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

Western University, 07 Sep 2007 to 06 Sep 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

Western University, 07 Sep 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jan 2015