THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 10:00:21 AM
Farid Araki, Keyghobad
CPSO#:
85535
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Mar 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
01 Mar 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Farsi
Education: Tehran University of Medical Sciences Sc, 1996
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
The Centre for Addiction and
Mental Health ARF Site
60 White Squirrel Way
Toronto ON M6J 1H4
Phone: (416) 535-8501
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:04 Oct 2012 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. KEYGHOBAD FARID ARAKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FARID ARAKI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2006 to 16 Oct 2006
PEAP - CF - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 17 Oct 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
CF - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
CF - Psychiatry
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 22 Sep 2008
AVP - Psychiatry
Queen's University, 23 Sep 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 24 Aug 2006 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 17 Oct 2006 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2008 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Sep 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 02 Jul 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Mar 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 01 Mar 2013 |