THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/04/24 4:07:58 AM
Parfrey, Brendan Patrick
CPSO#:
85489
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2007
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
19 Sep 2008
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Memorial University of Newfoundland Facu, 2004
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Cardiology Consultants
8 Rowan Street
PO Box 23042 RPO Churchill Square
St. John's NL A1B 4J9
Phone: (709) 726-5311
Fax: (709) 726-1028
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Brendan Parfrey Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Nov 13 2015
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Newfoundland and Labrador
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2008 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Cardiology |
Effective:16 Sep 2010 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. BRENDAN PATRICK PARFREY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PARFREY is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 14 Aug 2006 to 08 Sep 2006
EL - Cardiology
Queen's University, 07 May 2007 to 03 Jun 2007
EL - Internal Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Cardiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Cardiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Sep 2012
CF - Cardiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 14 Aug 2006 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 08 Sep 2006 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 07 May 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 03 Jun 2007 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2007 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 19 Sep 2008 |