THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/04/24 17:02:38 PM
Restrepo Garces, Carlos Eduardo
CPSO#:
85483
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of
29 Oct 2018
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
22 Oct 2018
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Unknown
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Instituto De Ciencias De La Salud, 1993
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 14 Sep 2006
PEAP - CF - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 15 Sep 2006 to 06 Jul 2007
CF - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 May 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 31 Dec 2010
CF - Anesthesiology
Queen's University, 22 Oct 2018 to 29 Oct 2018
PEAP - CF - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 04 Aug 2006 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Sep 2006 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 06 Jul 2007 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 10 Jul 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Dec 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 22 Oct 2018 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 29 Oct 2018 |