skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 17/10/21 0:16:09 AM

Ali, Muhammad

CPSO#: 85474

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 02 Apr 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 02 Apr 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Urdu

Education:University of Baluchistan, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Hospital for Sick Children
Division of Hematology/Oncology
555 University Ave
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-7654 Ext. 201438
Fax: (416) 813-5327 Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatric Hematology/Oncology Effective:01 Aug 2019 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 05 Sep 2006
PEAP - CF - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology

University of Toronto, 06 Sep 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
CF - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
CF - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
CF - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 03 Aug 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Sep 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 27 Jul 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 27 Jul 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 07 Jun 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 26 Apr 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 02 Apr 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Aug 2019

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 01 Aug 2019 Active
             Dr.   Muhammad   Ali   may   practise   medicine   independently  in  pediatric
            hematology/oncology.