THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/03/23 19:49:55 PM
Bailie, Neil Alexander
CPSO#:
85454
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
03 Sep 2021
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
03 Sep 2021
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University Belfast School of Med, 1994
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
200 Elizabeth St
Toronto General Hospital
Department of Otolaryngology - Head
8N-875
Toronto ON M5G 2C4
Phone: 4163405185
Fax: 4163403327
Electoral District: 10
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery |
Effective:03 Sep 2021 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2006 to 16 Oct 2006
PEAP - CF - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
University of Toronto, 17 Oct 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
CF - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
CF - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
CF - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 16 Oct 2009
CF - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Aug 2006 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 17 Oct 2006 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 16 Oct 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 03 Sep 2021 |
Expiry as per terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Expiry Date: 02 Sep 2028 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 03 Sep 2021 |
|
Active |