skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 24/07/21 7:50:02 AM

Chui, Betty Ka-Yeung

CPSO#: 85446

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 05 Sep 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 05 Sep 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English

Education:University Of Toronto, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
237 Barton St E
Hamilton General Hospital
Division of General Internal Medici
McMaster Wing Rm 427
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 44562
Fax: (365) 317-7893 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Betty Chui Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 23 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Chui ( CPSO# 85446 )

Business Address:
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5

Business Address:
Hamilton General Hospital
Division of Nephrology
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone Number: (905) 527-0271

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp Mc,Master & Childr Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective:23 Sep 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. BETTY KA-YEUNG CHUI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHUI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 31 Jul 2006 to 27 Aug 2006
EL - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 31 Jul 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 27 Aug 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Sep 2013