THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 5:05:07 AM
McLaren, Jesse Thomas Tigar
CPSO#:
85444
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
22 Feb 2008
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
22 Feb 2008
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: University of British Columbia Faculty o, 2005
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Toronto General Hospital
200 Elizabeth Street
R Fraser Elliot Building
Ground Floor, Room 480
Toronto ON M5G2C4
Phone: (416) 340-3856
Fax: (416)340-4300
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site |
Toronto |
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:20 Jun 2007 |
CFPC Specialist |
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) |
Effective:12 Nov 2008 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JESSE THOMAS TIGAR MCLAREN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCLAREN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2006 to 31 Aug 2006
EL - Emergency Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Aug 2006 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Aug 2006 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 22 Feb 2008 |