THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
18/04/24 21:53:39 PM
Iakovleva, Gaiane Khatchatourovna
CPSO#:
85436
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
16 Aug 2007
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
16 Aug 2007
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Russian
Education: Tyumen State Medical Academy, 1992
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Markham Stouffville Hospital
Department of Pathology
PO Box 1800
381 Church Street
Markham ON L3P 7P3
Phone: (905) 472-7000
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation |
Oakville |
Markham Stouffville Hospital |
Markham |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anatomical Pathology |
Effective:30 Jun 2007 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. GAIANE KHATCHATOUROVNA IAKOVLEVA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. IAKOVLEVA is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2006 to 29 Aug 2006
PEAP - R - Anatomical Pathology
University of Toronto, 30 Aug 2006 to 31 Jan 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Aug 2006 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 29 Aug 2006 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Sep 2006 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Jan 2007 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 16 Aug 2007 |