THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
31/03/23 15:49:47 PM
Gagnon, Michael Paul
CPSO#:
85425
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
04 Apr 2008
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
04 Apr 2008
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland Sch, 2004
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 209
170 McEwan Drive
Bolton ON L7E 4C8
Phone: (905) 951-7525
Fax: (905) 951-3419
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Headwaters Health Care Centre,Orangeville-Dufferin Site |
Orangeville |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:15 Feb 2008 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MICHAEL PAUL GAGNON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GAGNON is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Aug 2006 to 31 Aug 2006
EL - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Aug 2006 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Aug 2006 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 18 Sep 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 04 Apr 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 04 Apr 2008 |