THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 23:30:01 PM
Radwi, Ghazala Rashid Haider Karamat
CPSO#:
85401
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of
30 Jun 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
01 Sep 2006
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
ENGLISH
Education: King Abdul Aziz University, 2002
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:09 Jun 2011 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 24 Jul 2006 to 25 Aug 2006
PEAP - R - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 26 Aug 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 31 Aug 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Sep 2007 to 31 Aug 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Sep 2008 to 31 Aug 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Hematology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 29 May 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Hematology
University of Ottawa, 30 May 2011 to 29 May 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Hematology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 11 Feb 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Hematology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 24 Jul 2006 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Sep 2006 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2012 |